Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rodriguez Calderon, Edgar B, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by the Plaintiff, Edgar B Rodriguez Calderon, against the Defendant, Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The Plaintiff is an individual residing in Osceola County, Florida, while the Defendant is a Florida corpora...
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE, WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.