Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sukhoo, Teeram, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Doe, John, Lm General Insurance Company, Mercury Indemnity Company Of America, Testa, Chrystal, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Teeram Sukhoo against John Doe, Chrystal Testa, and Mercury Indemnity Company of America. The complaint alleges negligence and seeks damages exceeding $30,000. Teeram Sukhoo claims that on May 20, 2016, John Doe negligently...
COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: April 21, 2022SIXTH AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 30, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 06, 2022AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: March 14, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: December 28, 2021DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT V OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 20, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: December 09, 2022PLAINTIFF EMERGENCY AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2022PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2022DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION *IF INTERPRETER IS REQUIRED, PLEASE ADVISE IMMEDIATELY*
Date: February 10, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021DOCKET HISTORY
Date: August 17, 2021PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NON PARTY SUBPOENAES
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES
Date: October 25, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS
Date: December 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2061 | Docket Event | ||
January 15, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.