Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Caraballo, Luis, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Foremost Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MURPHY, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Luis Caraballo against Foremost Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The complaint alleges damages greater than $30,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney...
COMPLAINT
Date: November 18, 202011/18/2020
Date: January 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER CASE LETTER TO ORANGE COUNTY | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST MAILED TO ORANGE COUNTY CLERK OF COURT (TRANSFER) | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED CHECK REQUEST | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER$10 WAIVED $410.00 | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2020099242 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020099594 | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST SENT TO ACCT ON 12/16/2020 | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RECEIPT # 2020092343 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.