Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Parrish, Sara, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHREIBER, MARGARET H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint was filed by Sara Parrish against Walmart Stores East, L.P. in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Walmart, resulting in injuries sustained by Sara...
COMPLAINT
Date: April 24, 2020NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION
Date: June 17, 20204/24/2020
Date: April 03, 20246/17/2020
Date: April 28, 2064Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2064 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE - RECORDED (OR.6231.455. / 2022091571) | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020038092 | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/27/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 001162 OC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.