Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Torres, Harold Leonel, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE & ABEYANCE PRETRIAL DIVERSION CONTRACT
Date: June 15, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2021062431
Date: July 12, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2021053415
Date: June 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: March 10, 2021JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE & ABEYANCE
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESS LIST
Date: February 20, 2021MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: January 12, 2021STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: January 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
Date: January 05, 2021STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 11, 2021DISCOVERY NOTICE OF BODY WORN CAMERA FOOTAGE SENT TO DEFENSE
Date: October 06, 2020NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST
Date: September 19, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: September 01, 2020NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY
Date: August 31, 2020INFORMATION
Date: August 12, 2020WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT
Date: August 31, 2020NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN
Date: June 23, 2020WARRANT ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 19, 2020SURETY BOND AS6K-704323 POSTED $5,000.00
Date: June 19, 2020ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: June 19, 20201/11/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/17/2021
Date: April 04, 20241/26/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/18/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/12/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/1/2020
Date: April 01, 20248/31/2020
Date: April 05, 20242/11/2021
Date: April 02, 20247/12/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2021
Date: April 04, 20242/22/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/14/2021
Date: April 01, 20243/10/2021
Date: April 01, 20242/20/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/31/2020
Date: April 02, 202410/6/2020
Date: April 01, 20241/5/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/23/2020
Date: April 01, 20248/31/2020
Date: April 01, 20249/19/2020
Date: April 01, 20246/19/2020
Date: April 05, 20246/19/2020
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.