Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ortiz-Colon, Erika Jazmin, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WOOTEN, WAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWOOTEN, WAYNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: December 29, 2021ACCEPTED INTO THE PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION PROGRAM
Date: July 29, 2021PRETRIAL INTERVENTION AGREEMENT
Date: November 23, 2021REQUEST TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT PRE-TRIAL
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST
Date: April 23, 2021REQUEST TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE AT PRE-TRIAL
Date: May 11, 2021JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE & ABEYANCE
Date: June 04, 2021INFORMATION
Date: December 09, 2020ORIGINAL TRAFFIC CITATION FILED
Date: December 01, 2020OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM
Date: November 30, 2020ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: December 09, 2020BOND (COPY SURETY)
Date: December 01, 2020CITATION FILED ADS25AE
Date: November 30, 202011/23/2021
Date: April 04, 20247/29/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/12/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/29/2021
Date: April 01, 20244/23/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/14/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/9/2020
Date: April 01, 20246/8/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/5/2021
Date: April 02, 20241/4/2021
Date: April 05, 20245/11/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/8/2020
Date: April 01, 20241/20/2021
Date: April 02, 202411/30/2020
Date: April 01, 202412/1/2020
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.