Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Calderon-Perez, Carlos Juan, represented by Defender, Public, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WISH, CARLY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
This complaint charges Carlos Juan Calderon-Perez with grand theft. It alleges that on or about October 23, 2020, in Osceola County, Florida, Calderon-Perez knowingly obtained or used a paint sprayer valued at $100 or more but less than $750 from the...
PAYMENT $265.90 RECEIPT #2021105257
Date: November 29, 2021PAYMENT $267.79 RECEIPT #2022009016
Date: January 31, 2022PAYMENT $4.12 RECEIPT #2022053153
Date: June 09, 2022PAYMENT $104.49 RECEIPT #2021112907
Date: December 21, 2021CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: April 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: May 25, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: April 29, 2021DOC PACKET
Date: April 29, 2021DOC SENTENCE
Date: April 29, 2021NOTICE OF PRIOR CONVICTION & CRIMINAL HISTORY
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN
Date: April 21, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: April 29, 2021AMENDED INFORMATION FILED:
Date: April 29, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN
Date: March 03, 2021BOND (COPY SURETY)
Date: March 01, 2021MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: January 06, 2021NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST
Date: January 05, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: November 17, 2020INFORMATION
Date: November 16, 2020OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM
Date: October 26, 20206/9/2022
Date: May 01, 202412/21/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/31/2022
Date: May 01, 20245/25/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/29/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/29/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/29/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/29/2021
Date: May 05, 20243/5/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/29/2021
Date: May 04, 20243/3/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/31/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/21/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/20/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/1/2021
Date: May 02, 202411/30/2020
Date: May 02, 20241/6/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/5/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/19/2021
Date: May 02, 202412/23/2020
Date: May 05, 202411/17/2020
Date: May 01, 202410/26/2020
Date: May 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.