Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dauria, Jackalynn Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with CARSTEN, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2020 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: April 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: May 25, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: April 29, 2021TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: December 09, 2020TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: March 11, 2021TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: January 21, 2021TRANSPORT ORDER
Date: December 21, 2020CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: October 30, 2020WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: October 29, 2020BOND (COPY SURETY)
Date: October 21, 2020OUT OF COUNTY ARREST REPORT COUNTY OF ARREST: ORANGE
Date: October 21, 2020ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: October 23, 2020WARRANT ISSUED
Date: September 22, 2020ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: September 01, 2020INFORMATION FILED
Date: August 31, 2020BOND (COPY SURETY)
Date: August 17, 2020CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE
Date: August 03, 20205/25/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/6/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/3/2021
Date: May 05, 20244/29/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/29/2021
Date: May 04, 20243/11/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/10/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/29/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/20/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/28/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/21/2021
Date: May 01, 202412/9/2020
Date: May 01, 202412/21/2020
Date: May 01, 202411/5/2020
Date: May 02, 202412/16/2020
Date: May 01, 202412/31/2020
Date: May 02, 202410/30/2020
Date: May 01, 202410/29/2020
Date: May 01, 202411/9/2020
Date: May 01, 202410/23/2020
Date: May 01, 202410/21/2020
Date: May 02, 202410/21/2020
Date: May 03, 20249/22/2020
Date: May 01, 20249/14/2020
Date: May 02, 20249/1/2020
Date: May 01, 20248/3/2020
Date: May 05, 20248/17/2020
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.