Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ditech Financial Llc F K A Green Tree Servicing Ll, Newrez Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bank Of New York As Successor In Interest To Jp Mo, Jacobs, Jeffrey W., Jacobs, Melodie N., Pro Roofing & Associate, Inc., United States Of America On Behalf Of The Small Bu, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with MURPHY, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
3/4/2019
Date: March 02, 20241/15/2019
Date: March 02, 20243/1/2019
Date: March 03, 20241/15/2019
Date: March 03, 20241/2/2020
Date: March 08, 20241/6/2020
Date: March 04, 20241/2/2020
Date: March 06, 20241/8/2020
Date: March 14, 20241/7/2020
Date: March 02, 20241/28/2019
Date: March 03, 20243/6/2019
Date: March 04, 20241/17/2019
Date: March 01, 20245/3/2023
Date: March 04, 20242/6/2019
Date: March 02, 20241/7/2020
Date: March 04, 20244/28/2023
Date: March 03, 20241/8/2020
Date: March 04, 202412/12/2019
Date: March 03, 20242/26/2019
Date: March 09, 20242/21/2023
Date: March 01, 20244/1/2019
Date: March 10, 20248/23/2021
Date: March 01, 20244/4/2019
Date: March 01, 202410/7/2021
Date: March 01, 20241/29/2020
Date: March 05, 202410/18/2021
Date: March 01, 20242/3/2020
Date: March 31, 20243/30/2020
Date: March 03, 20244/2/2020
Date: March 02, 20242/27/2019
Date: March 03, 20242/26/2019
Date: March 04, 20244/1/2019
Date: March 05, 20242/3/2021
Date: March 03, 20248/19/2021
Date: March 03, 20241/15/2019
Date: March 06, 20248/18/2021
Date: March 04, 20245/1/2023
Date: March 01, 20243/14/2023
Date: March 01, 20241/20/2020
Date: March 04, 20249/24/2021
Date: March 03, 20241/31/2020
Date: March 08, 202410/18/2021
Date: March 03, 20241/16/2020
Date: March 03, 20242/5/2019
Date: March 05, 20241/27/2020
Date: March 02, 20243/15/2019
Date: March 13, 202412/30/2019
Date: March 05, 20244/7/2020
Date: March 05, 20243/16/2020
Date: March 01, 20244/28/2023
Date: March 01, 20241/15/2019
Date: March 31, 20248/25/2021
Date: March 06, 202410/18/2021
Date: March 14, 202410/6/2021
Date: March 02, 20243/4/2020
Date: March 03, 20241/16/2019
Date: March 10, 20241/24/2019
Date: March 03, 20241/24/2019
Date: March 02, 202412/30/2019
Date: March 06, 20241/15/2019
Date: March 01, 20245/2/2023
Date: March 01, 2024PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: October 07, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 19, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF''S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 25, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: March 16, 2020MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT
Date: October 06, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2021075478
Date: August 23, 2021PLAINTIFF MOTION RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 18, 2021CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: January 29, 2020NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 04, 2020NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 03, 2021MOTION TO DISPENSE WITH MEDIATION
Date: January 16, 2020ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: January 27, 2020JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: January 08, 2020UNILATERAL PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: January 07, 2020N AMENDED OTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 20, 2020PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 02, 2020PLAINTIFF AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: January 06, 2020ORDER UPON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISPENSE WITH MEDIATION
Date: January 27, 2020DEFENDANT TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: January 07, 2020ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Date: October 18, 2021MOTION TO VACATE ORDER OF CLERKS DEFAULT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 15, 2019PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: March 01, 2019ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: March 06, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: January 16, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: February 26, 2019DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS
Date: February 27, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: April 01, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/23/2019 PARTY SERVED: MELODIE N JACOBS
Date: January 24, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 1/22/2019@135PM PARTY SERVED: USA ATTORNEY
Date: January 24, 2019PAYMENT $964.00 RECEIPT #2019005881
Date: January 17, 2019NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COSTS
Date: October 18, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: January 02, 2020PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: December 12, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)
Date: January 15, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 15, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: January 15, 2019SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY 6-21-BK-04711
Date: October 18, 2021ORDER SETTING NON-JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL
Date: December 30, 2019PLAINTIFF MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: December 30, 2019PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET SET FOR APRIL 28, 2020
Date: March 30, 2020NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)
Date: February 06, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: January 31, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/23/2019 PARTY SERVED: JEFFREY W JACOBS
Date: January 24, 2019ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR APRIL 28, 2020
Date: April 02, 2020NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE
Date: February 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: February 26, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 08, 2020PLAINTIFF TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: April 01, 2019VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
Date: January 15, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: January 15, 2019NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT.702.015(4) CERTIFICATION
Date: January 15, 2019ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: March 14, 2023COVER LETTER RE: ORDER ON MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: February 21, 2023MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT (FEES NOT PAID)
Date: October 06, 2021CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - RECORDED (OR.6396.1418. / 2023051917)
Date: January 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.