Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Henriques, Janalie, against Abdul Latif, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management169 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2009 |
CategoryCollections - Consumer Credit (Crc 3.740) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION HEARING DATE, TIME, LOCATIO N (CHAPTER 13) RECEIVED Not Applicable |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE TRUSTEES MOTION TO DISMISS CHAPTER 13 CASE RECD FROM US BANKRUPTCY COURT Not Applicable |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR FILING OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHIN 360 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTIONS) - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR ATTY HENRIQUE S FAILURE TO APPEAR 6/10/10 & PROSECUTE CASE - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FLING COMPLAINT VACATED |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (COLLECTIONS) - Minutes Complete |
|
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT CANNOT BE ENTERED AT THIS TIME AS TO ABDUL LATIF FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.