Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
People'S Trust Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Munoz, Leonidas, Soto, Amparo, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 166 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2071 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER (PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED) | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DEISNGATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK) | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER | |
May 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 FLA R JUD ADMIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.