Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Citibank, N.A., As Trustee For Cwabs, Inc. Asset-B, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Association Of Poinciana Villages, Inc., Maurice Ward, Poinciana Village One Association, Inc., Silvia Ward, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 281 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
5/2/2018
Date: May 01, 20243/1/2019
Date: May 02, 20249/6/2022
Date: May 02, 20243/15/2023
Date: May 08, 20245/31/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/26/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/2/2018
Date: May 10, 20242/12/2019
Date: May 03, 20242/27/2019
Date: May 07, 20243/8/2019
Date: May 03, 202410/25/2022
Date: May 04, 20249/19/2022
Date: May 05, 20242/1/2023
Date: May 05, 20245/31/2023
Date: May 09, 20243/2/2023
Date: May 17, 20246/29/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/5/2019
Date: May 01, 20242/8/2019
Date: May 06, 20245/2/2018
Date: May 01, 204010/3/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/25/2023
Date: May 03, 20242/22/2019
Date: May 02, 20248/10/2023
Date: May 11, 20248/31/2022
Date: May 01, 20247/12/2022
Date: May 05, 20245/31/2023
Date: May 10, 202411/21/2022
Date: May 03, 202412/2/2022
Date: May 05, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 01, 2812/16/2023
Date: May 10, 202411/18/2022
Date: May 06, 20242/16/2023
Date: May 03, 20242/28/2023
Date: May 11, 20243/1/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/2/2023
Date: May 04, 20247/19/2023
Date: May 02, 202411/23/2018
Date: May 05, 20246/3/2021
Date: May 03, 20243/31/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/8/2022
Date: May 09, 20247/11/2018
Date: May 06, 202411/30/2021
Date: May 11, 202411/20/2018
Date: May 02, 20246/9/2021
Date: May 19, 20241/26/2022
Date: May 08, 20241/14/2022
Date: May 03, 20245/16/2022
Date: May 05, 20245/30/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/31/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/1/2022
Date: May 06, 20243/21/2019
Date: May 04, 20245/20/2022
Date: May 03, 20243/10/2021
Date: May 06, 20246/7/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/10/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/1/2019
Date: May 01, 20245/14/2021
Date: May 04, 20246/14/2018
Date: May 02, 20247/18/2018
Date: May 06, 20248/1/2018
Date: May 07, 20243/22/2022
Date: May 11, 20247/20/2018
Date: May 02, 20244/22/2022
Date: May 09, 20246/10/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/10/2022
Date: May 03, 202411/4/2021
Date: May 07, 202410/28/2021
Date: May 08, 20245/3/2022
Date: May 07, 20242/4/2019
Date: May 02, 20247/6/2021
Date: May 03, 20241/19/2022
Date: May 07, 20246/1/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/18/2021
Date: May 11, 20241/22/2019
Date: May 10, 20246/14/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/11/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/11/2020
Date: May 02, 20246/2/2022
Date: May 02, 20243/31/2021
Date: May 07, 20246/2/2022
Date: May 05, 20245/24/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/15/2023
Date: May 01, 20246/7/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/6/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/6/2022
Date: May 01, 20243/11/2021
Date: May 03, 20244/25/2022
Date: May 05, 20245/3/2022
Date: May 08, 202411/8/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/20/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/16/2023
Date: May 10, 20248/21/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/4/2022
Date: May 03, 20245/16/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/16/2021
Date: May 05, 20245/23/2022
Date: May 14, 20241/28/2019
Date: May 02, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 03, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS
Date: May 14, 2021MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: May 02, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL OF FINAL ORDER
Date: March 21, 2019CITIBANKS RENEWED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR ALTERNATIVELY DISMISSAL
Date: February 27, 2019NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING
Date: March 01, 2019PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 22, 2019AGREED ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2018DEFENDANT MOTION TO TAX FEES ABD COSTS
Date: March 08, 2019ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 08, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS THE INSTANT ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND EMBEDDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 22, 2019ORDER (FWRD TO JUDGE'S ASSISTANT)
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 01, 2019NOTICE OF FILING - COMPLETE LOAN MODIFICATION AGREEMENT
Date: August 01, 2018DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: February 04, 2019RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OBJECTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: February 12, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 20, 2018PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: June 08, 2022NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME, EFFORT, AND COSTS
Date: June 02, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: June 01, 2022DEFENDANT WITNESS MST
Date: May 16, 2022PLAINTIFF''S AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 16, 2022JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: May 23, 2022DEFENDANT EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 10, 2022PLAINTIFF''S TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 03, 2022PLAINTIFF''S NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: March 31, 2022ORDER SETTING NON JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL
Date: April 25, 2022PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF FILING OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT MAURICE WARD TRIAL EXHIBITS
Date: June 01, 2022PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENT TO DEFENDANTS
Date: April 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON JURY FORECLOSURE TRIAL
Date: May 03, 2022DEFENDANT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTION REGARDING PLAINTIFF DUCES TECUM ITEMS
Date: February 11, 2022AMENDED RE NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: January 26, 2022RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: January 19, 2022REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS
Date: November 30, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 28, 2022
Date: January 14, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (ADDING ZOOM INFORMATION
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 06, 2021PLAINTIFF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 18, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT
Date: June 10, 2021ANSWER AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 31, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 10, 2021PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT REQUEST FOR ADMISSION
Date: March 11, 2021DEFENDANT FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION
Date: May 02, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: May 04, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: October 03, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 19, 2022ORDER CONTINUING NON JURY TRAIL
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL
Date: March 15, 2023PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO VACATE AND AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL (EMAILED CLK)
Date: February 28, 2023DEFENDANT MOTION FOR REHEARING
Date: February 16, 2023PLAINTIFF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION FOR REHEARING
Date: March 02, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: May 18, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - RECORDED (OR.6353.716. / 2023013436)
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF TRIAL DATED FEBRUARY 1 2023
Date: February 09, 2023DEFENDANT MOTION TO VACATE AND AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED ON FEBRUARY 1 2023
Date: February 16, 2023CERTIFIED AND RECORDED COPY OF NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL
Date: March 15, 2023LETTER TO JUDGE RE AGREED ORDER
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER REGARDING CROSS APPEAL FEES
Date: April 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2040 | Docket Event | ||
May 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.