Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WRONA, JENNIFER vs WRONA, MARK
On December 14, 2017 a dissolution of marriage w/children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. Judge MADRIGAL, DIEGO presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 14, 2017
Last Refreshed
August 12, 2022
Filing Location
Osceola County, FL
Category
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCE | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) FOR MARK | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICAION OF JUDGMENT | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRIVATE MEDIATION | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) FOR JENNIFER | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 01/26/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN VR BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF DEATH FOR STEVEN HALIM, ESQ. AND NOTICE OF PETITIONER'S EMAIL | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CHILD TIMESHARING INTERROGATORIES | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT SET FOR 12/06/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN VR BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF PARENTING PLAN, MAKEUP TIME AND REIMBURSEMENT OF PLANE FARES AND ATTORNEYS FEES | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISPENSE WITH MEDIATION | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO RESPONDENT/FORMER HUSBAND'S SUPPLEMENTAL COUNTER-PETITION FOR MODIFICIATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT/FORMER HUSBAND'S ANSWER TO PETITIONER/FORMER WIFE'S SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT,L AND RESPONDENT/FORMER HUSBAND'S SUPPLEMENTAL COUNTER-PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SET FOR 06/09/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN 5D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET ASIDE SET FOR 06/08/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN 5D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED ANSWER TO PETITION/FORMER WIFE'S SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT, AND RESPONDENT/FORMER HUSBAND'S SUPPLEMENTAL COUNTER-PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S DEFAUL (SIC) AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DEFAULT | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST RESPONDENT, MARK WRONA | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020008304 | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT/FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION TO DISMISS PETITIONER/FORMER WIFE'S SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING SET FOR 01/27/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 5D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | UNCONTESTED CHECKLIST | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY DATED: 06/06/2019 | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT OF Dissolution of Marriage | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2019059059 | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) FOR MARK | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING SWORN TESTIMONY | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL PARENTING PLAN | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION FOR JENNIFER | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WRITTEN EX PARTE FINAL HEARING & WAIVER OF COURT APPEARANCE BY PARTIES | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS HEARING SET FOR 05/16/2019 AT 9:30 AM IN 3D BEFORE JUDGE: RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S NOTICE EVIDENCE LIST FOR TRIAL | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S ANSWER TO PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION FOR Dissolution of Marriage | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATED ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND COUNTER-PETITION FOR Dissolution of Marriage | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY DATED:02/20/2019 | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONAVAILABILITY | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO AMEND COUNT-PETITION FOR Dissolution of Marriage | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S PROPOSED PARENTING PLAN | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | TRIAL SET FOR 05/22/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D BEFORE JUDGE: RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL AND ORDER CONTROLLING NON JURY TRIAL PURSUANT TO FLA.FAMILY LAW RULE 12.200 (D) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | HUSBAND;S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/07/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D BEFORE JUDGE: RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET CASE AT ISSUE | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONAVAILABILITY | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR REPORT | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL & REQUIREMENT TO ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTER-PETITION | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | MEDIATION-FAMILY SET FOR 05/16/2018 AT 1:30 PM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: Z HALKER-SIMPSON, JANIS M | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR MARK | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO DISPUTE RESOLUTION SERVICES FROM THE CASE MANAGEMENT UNIT | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2018013987 | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | INFORMATION FOR SCHEDULING MEDIATION PRIOR TO SETTING TRIAL | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | READ THE ATTACHED ORDER CAREFULLY,IT APPLIES TO YOU AND YOU WILL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR COMPLYING WITH THE ORDER | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO PETITION FOR Dissolution of Marriage | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $407.50 RECEIPT #2017119329 | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/15/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 DR 005015 DC | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR JENNIFER | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR Dissolution of Marriage | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) FOR JENNIFER | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR Dissolution of Marriage ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING |