Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Kristy Lavonne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis Jr., Bobby, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SHAFFER, LAURA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2017 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | AUDIT WORKSHEET PER ORDER ON 6-28-2019 AND IWO 3-20-2020. | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT ORDER AND FLORIDA ADDENDUM (EMAILED TO AUDITORS) | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RESPONDENT'S CURRENT ADDRESS | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | DIRECT DEPOSIT FORM | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $54.00 RECEIPT #2019101236 | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RESPONDENT'S CURRENT ADDRESS | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RECORDED (OR.5553.2406. / 2019087842) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.