Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GORMAN, BRIAN vs. GORMAN, ALEXIANDIRA
On March 31, 2017 an eviction residential - non- monetary case was filed by Gorman, Brian, against Gorman, Alexiandira, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. Judge JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 31, 2017
Last Refreshed
October 12, 2023
Filing Location
Osceola County, FL
Category
COUNTY CIVIL
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Want of Prosecution
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION - RECORDED (OR.6230.2300. / 2022091089) | |
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION SET FOR 06/07/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C | |
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 4/4/17 PARTY SERVED: ALEXANDRIA LEIGH GORMAN | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/31/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000790 EV | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (15 DAY) | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017033681 | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) |