Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
King, Kristtine E, King, William Kerry, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bondy, Jennifer R, against Farinato, Lisa, Farinato, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MURPHY, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT (EXHIBIT A)
Date: September 21, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2017CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF NOTE
Date: September 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF WILLIAM KERRY KING OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS SET FOR 04/02/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: MURPHY, MICHAEL | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS SET FOR 04/02/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: MURPHY, MICHAEL | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FRAUD UPON THE COURT | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ROBERT FARINATO AND LISA FARINATO MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FRAUD UPON THE COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.