Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dejesus, Aracelis, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Delattre, Tom, against Russell Gibson, Sheriff Of Osceola County In His, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 120 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Aracelis Dejesus against Russell Gibson, Sheriff of Osceola County, in his official capacity. The complaint alleges that on July 23, 2015, deputies from the Osceola County Sheriff's Office raided Dejesus's home while she wa...
COMPLAINT
Date: October 27, 2017PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 12, 2021SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 20182/1/2022
Date: January 05, 20242/1/2023
Date: January 16, 20603/4/2022
Date: January 05, 20243/29/2021
Date: January 03, 20246/30/2023
Date: January 16, 20665/9/2023
Date: January 07, 202412/17/2018
Date: January 06, 20245/12/2021
Date: January 16, 13010/27/2017
Date: January 16, 20374/30/2021
Date: January 03, 20245/18/2022
Date: January 16, 2156/19/2023
Date: January 02, 20244/5/2022
Date: January 02, 20246/14/2023
Date: January 05, 20246/30/2023
Date: January 07, 20247/11/2023
Date: January 06, 20246/11/2023
Date: January 09, 20245/30/2023
Date: January 02, 20246/16/2023
Date: January 24, 202410/27/2017
Date: January 04, 202412/28/2021
Date: January 02, 20244/28/2021
Date: January 14, 20246/12/2023
Date: January 02, 202411/27/2017
Date: January 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2066 | Docket Event | ||
January 16, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
January 16, 2045 | Docket Event | ||
January 16, 2039 | Docket Event | ||
January 16, 2037 | Docket Event | ||
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.