Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Meisels, Jonathan, against Department Of The Treasure, Pariseau, Richard W, Pariseau, Victoria M, Shaver, Debra C, Shaver, Ira S, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-NC2, against various defendants. The plaintiff alle...
PROGRESS DOCKET FROM 5DCA/DISMISSED 2/23/2021
Date: April 09, 2021E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE/NOTICE OF APPEAL FWD TO 5DCA
Date: January 26, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 26 2021
Date: January 25, 2021LETTER SENT WITH INDEX OF APPEAL TO CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Date: December 16, 2019LETTER SENT WITH INDEX OF APPEAL TO ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID PL
Date: December 16, 2019LETTER SENT WITH INDEX OF APPEAL TO NEW REZ
Date: December 16, 2019E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - FIFTH DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL
Date: January 25, 2021ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: November 17, 2020LETTER SENT WITH INDEX OF APPEAL TO PHH MORTGAGE SERVICES
Date: December 16, 2019LETTER SENT WITH INDEX OF APPEAL TO DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Date: December 16, 2019PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: November 09, 2020LETTER SENT WITH INDEX TO APPEAL TO IRA AND DEBRA SHAVER
Date: December 16, 2019MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: June 14, 2017RESPONSE TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: March 15, 2018ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR NOVEMBER 21 2019
Date: November 14, 2019ADDENDUM
Date: November 14, 2019RESPONSE TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: May 14, 2018PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 05, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: May 23, 2017PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: January 21, 2021E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE/APPEAL ACCEPTED AT 5DCA
Date: January 26, 2021CERTIFIED COPY OF NOTICE OF APPEAL - RECORDED (OR.5876.62. / 2021010383)
Date: January 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL - RECORDED (OR.5621.1302. / 2019146431)
Date: November 08, 2019FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - RECORDED (OR.5561.2223. / 2019095252)
Date: July 24, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: July 25, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: November 12, 2019MEDIATION REPORT
Date: December 21, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: June 28, 2019E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM 5DCA
Date: November 12, 2019DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 30, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVITS
Date: July 18, 2019NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVITS
Date: March 13, 2019CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: December 12, 2018PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: July 27, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 13, 2018CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: June 15, 2017NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE; ORIGINAL MORTGAGE
Date: March 21, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: September 21, 2017PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESET FORECLOSURE SALE DATE
Date: April 13, 2022PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2022035534
Date: April 18, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 06, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: June 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 26, 2022SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY 6-22-BK-02254 FILED BY DEFENDANT
Date: June 27, 2022MEMORANDUM FROM 5DCA
Date: March 15, 2021PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 26 2021
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL COSTS
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: January 26, 2021INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: March 01, 2021RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: CHARLES W FRANKLIN, ESQ
Date: February 03, 2021LETTER TO ATTORNEY FOR APPELLEE AND ALL SERVICE LIST
Date: March 01, 2021MEMORANDUM 5D19-3310
Date: January 02, 2020STATEMENT FOR PREPARATION OF APPEAL
Date: March 01, 2021ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE/5D21-270
Date: January 26, 2021E-FILING CONFIRMATION OF NEW NOTICE OF APPEAL BEING SENT TO 5DCA
Date: January 25, 2021PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2021003238
Date: January 13, 2021PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE DATE
Date: November 09, 2020INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: December 16, 2019PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020087931
Date: November 10, 2020STATEMENT FOR PREPARATION OF APPEAL
Date: December 16, 2019RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: CHARLES W FRANKLING
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: January 05, 2021LETTER TO APPELLANT
Date: March 01, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2021006075
Date: January 22, 2021SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL, RETURNED, SERVED ON STEVEN SHAVER
Date: March 19, 2019PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR NOVEMBER 21 2019
Date: November 07, 2019EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/ EVIDENCE LOG
Date: July 24, 2019PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019111261
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: October 25, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCING ADDITIONAL TRIAL EXHIBITS
Date: July 17, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: January 22, 2021PLAINTIFF TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: June 28, 2019SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY 19-01748-6B3
Date: March 19, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCING TRIAL EXHIBIT
Date: July 10, 2019PLAINTIFF AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: July 09, 2019PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: October 19, 2018PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 10, 2018PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: May 15, 2019MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: October 09, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 28, 2018ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: June 14, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: December 07, 2018PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: February 27, 2019ORDER ON DEFENDANTS IRA S SHAVER AND DEBRE C SHAVER MOTION FOR IMMDIATE REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: December 04, 2018SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL, RETURNED, SERVED ON DEBRA CHARMAIN SHAVER
Date: March 19, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: February 22, 2019AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 20, 2018ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL
Date: January 28, 2019PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: January 11, 2019PLAINTIFF TRIAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: February 22, 2019DEFENDANT IRA S SHAVER AND DEBRA C SHAVER FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 09, 2018DEFENDANT IRA S SHAVER AND DEBRA C SHAVER AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 09, 2018DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY
Date: April 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 17, 2018PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 16, 2018DEFENDANT IRA S SHAVER AND DEBRA C SHAVER FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 30, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 15, 2018PLAINTIFF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT
Date: August 10, 2018LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY
Date: July 24, 2018DEFENDANT IRA S SHAVER AND DEBRA C SHAVER ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: July 30, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM
Date: July 20, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR IRA STEVEN
Date: June 19, 2017PROOF OF PAYMENT RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE MEDIATION RMFM PROGRAM FEES
Date: June 05, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR DEBRA C SHAVER
Date: July 07, 2017LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 14, 2017PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM
Date: December 21, 2017NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 9 2018
Date: July 10, 2018REPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM
Date: December 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2018DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS
Date: April 09, 2018ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM
Date: November 16, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 12, 2018LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY
Date: May 14, 2018PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: August 17, 2017LETTER TO HOMEOWNER FROM RMFM PROGRAM
Date: June 05, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 23, 2017NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: 12TH SEPTEMBER 2017 FROM DEBRA CHARMAIN SHAVER
Date: July 21, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TRUSTEE OF THE NSS TRUST
Date: May 30, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)
Date: June 08, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE NSS TRUST
Date: May 30, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY ON IRA STEVEN SHAVER
Date: June 19, 2017PAYMENT $1,989.00 RECEIPT #2017052527
Date: May 24, 2017INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK
Date: July 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: July 05, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: May 23, 2017DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY
Date: May 23, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: May 23, 2017FORM A
Date: May 23, 2017NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION
Date: May 23, 2017VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: May 23, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 23, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 23, 2017PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2022100366
Date: October 31, 2022NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 29, 2022PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR NOVEMBER 15 2022
Date: October 26, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR NOVEMBER 15 2022
Date: November 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: October 13, 2022ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 23, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE:
Date: October 13, 2022PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2022086183
Date: September 16, 2022PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 14, 20227/5/2017
Date: May 05, 20244/26/2022
Date: May 06, 20245/14/2018
Date: May 22, 202411/15/2019
Date: May 01, 20245/14/2018
Date: May 03, 20241/28/2019
Date: May 03, 20249/17/2018
Date: May 02, 20366/27/2022
Date: May 04, 20243/13/2019
Date: May 07, 20241/10/2019
Date: May 06, 20249/12/2023
Date: May 04, 20246/8/2017
Date: May 02, 20247/24/2019
Date: May 06, 20245/23/2017
Date: May 02, 20487/7/2017
Date: May 03, 20245/31/2023
Date: May 04, 202411/16/2017
Date: May 02, 202412/21/2017
Date: May 04, 202411/9/2020
Date: May 05, 20241/5/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/23/2017
Date: May 02, 20247/20/2017
Date: May 02, 20247/21/2017
Date: May 01, 20247/24/2018
Date: May 01, 20247/5/2017
Date: May 03, 20246/26/2017
Date: May 02, 20249/27/2018
Date: May 09, 20247/27/2017
Date: May 01, 20245/30/2017
Date: May 02, 202410/13/2022
Date: May 06, 202410/9/2018
Date: May 09, 20242/27/2019
Date: May 04, 20242/22/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/9/2018
Date: May 03, 20245/15/2019
Date: May 03, 20246/6/2017
Date: May 03, 20246/2/2023
Date: May 01, 20247/10/2018
Date: May 03, 20244/5/2018
Date: May 05, 20246/28/2019
Date: May 07, 20244/5/2018
Date: May 04, 20246/7/2017
Date: May 03, 20247/18/2019
Date: May 07, 20241/2/2020
Date: May 02, 20241/22/2021
Date: May 05, 202411/8/2019
Date: May 20, 20245/23/2017
Date: May 09, 20246/14/2019
Date: May 04, 202411/28/2018
Date: May 04, 20243/15/2021
Date: May 02, 20248/30/2023
Date: May 03, 20245/30/2018
Date: May 11, 20243/22/2023
Date: May 01, 20249/11/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/16/2019
Date: May 02, 20247/5/2017
Date: May 01, 20245/14/2018
Date: May 01, 20241/11/2019
Date: May 04, 20241/22/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/24/2017
Date: May 01, 202410/9/2018
Date: May 03, 202410/13/2022
Date: May 01, 20243/1/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/13/2022
Date: May 10, 202412/16/2019
Date: May 06, 20245/25/2023
Date: May 04, 20246/19/2017
Date: May 04, 20246/28/2019
Date: May 13, 20241/12/2021
Date: May 04, 202412/21/2018
Date: May 01, 20241/25/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/20/2017
Date: May 02, 20241/26/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/1/2021
Date: May 08, 20242/26/2018
Date: May 03, 20241/20/2021
Date: May 03, 20247/10/2019
Date: May 03, 202411/14/2019
Date: May 03, 20247/30/2018
Date: May 04, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/9/2019
Date: May 03, 20244/18/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/23/2023
Date: May 06, 202411/1/2018
Date: May 03, 20241/13/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/1/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/3/2021
Date: May 05, 202411/10/2020
Date: May 01, 20249/16/2022
Date: May 01, 20247/25/2023
Date: May 03, 202412/4/2018
Date: May 03, 20244/12/2018
Date: May 01, 202412/21/2017
Date: May 03, 20245/23/2017
Date: May 04, 202411/21/2017
Date: May 05, 202411/12/2019
Date: May 01, 20247/30/2018
Date: May 15, 20245/23/2017
Date: May 03, 20248/17/2017
Date: May 01, 20247/25/2018
Date: May 02, 20249/21/2017
Date: May 05, 20243/19/2019
Date: May 03, 20245/5/2021
Date: May 04, 20248/15/2018
Date: May 03, 20241/25/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/21/2018
Date: May 08, 20246/14/2017
Date: May 02, 20246/16/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/22/2019
Date: May 08, 20246/5/2017
Date: May 02, 20246/15/2017
Date: May 03, 20244/20/2022
Date: May 03, 202412/12/2018
Date: May 04, 20243/1/2021
Date: May 10, 20249/12/2023
Date: May 06, 20241/21/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/5/2017
Date: May 01, 202411/14/2019
Date: May 02, 202410/31/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/25/2021
Date: May 02, 202412/7/2018
Date: May 04, 20247/24/2019
Date: May 01, 20245/23/2017
Date: May 28, 20244/19/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/12/2018
Date: May 05, 202410/19/2018
Date: May 04, 202411/9/2022
Date: May 06, 20246/13/2018
Date: May 04, 20248/8/2018
Date: May 18, 20249/14/2022
Date: May 10, 20248/24/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/23/2017
Date: May 04, 20249/29/2022
Date: May 03, 202411/12/2019
Date: May 09, 20247/31/2023
Date: May 06, 20248/22/2023
Date: May 06, 20245/18/2023
Date: May 01, 20248/23/2023
Date: May 04, 20246/19/2017
Date: May 03, 20241/12/2021
Date: May 02, 20409/23/2022
Date: May 03, 20248/16/2018
Date: May 06, 202412/6/2018
Date: May 06, 20244/25/2023
Date: May 03, 202411/2/2022
Date: May 03, 20245/23/2017
Date: May 01, 20246/5/2018
Date: May 11, 20247/17/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/21/2019
Date: May 02, 20338/1/2018
Date: May 07, 202410/26/2022
Date: May 03, 20246/2/2023
Date: May 10, 202411/17/2020
Date: May 02, 202410/25/2019
Date: May 04, 20247/17/2019
Date: May 06, 20242/3/2021
Date: May 12, 20242/22/2019
Date: May 06, 20243/10/2021
Date: May 11, 20247/25/2019
Date: May 09, 20244/26/2023
Date: May 05, 20246/6/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/21/2021
Date: May 01, 20249/20/2018
Date: May 03, 20248/10/2018
Date: May 06, 20242/20/2023
Date: May 04, 20249/11/2023
Date: May 04, 202412/16/2019
Date: May 01, 20241/26/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/25/2023
Date: May 24, 202411/7/2019
Date: May 12, 20241/25/2021
Date: May 12, 20248/10/2018
Date: May 02, 20408/31/2023
Date: May 01, 20246/14/2017
Date: May 03, 20243/15/2018
Date: May 22, 202411/6/2018
Date: May 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2048 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2040 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2040 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2036 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2033 | Docket Event | ||
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.