Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Torres, Abraham, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Moody, Betty, Moody, Damon A, Moody, Ernest, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION /COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/NOTICE OF HEARING - RECORDED (OR.5727.1200. / 2020068139) | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/NOTICE OF HEARING (BLANK ORDER) | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL-LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 05/15/2020 AT 11:00 AM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SCHREIBER, MARGARET H | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC) | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $435.00 RECEIPT #2017044332 | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/28/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 001132 MF | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED EARNEST MOODY, BETTY MOODY, DAMON ANDRE MOODY (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.