Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Travieso, Jennifer, against Feliciano, Lizzette, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC) | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFENDANTS | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR CLERK DEFAULT | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO THE CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION AND UPDATED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.