Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bowen, Robert Klien, against Any Unknown Heirs Devisees Grantees Creditors And Other Unknown Persons Or Unknown Spouses Claiming By Through And Under Any Of The Above Named Defendants, Colon Harris, Migdalia, Harris, Gary, Unknown Tenant I, Unknown Tenant Ii, (total of 5) See All represented by Paasch, Michael A Esq, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with POLODNA, SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePOLODNA, SCOTT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL (FILED IN OPEN COURT) | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT- 06/16- DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANT 1 NKA LUIS COLON | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN MILITARY SERVICE | |
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF COUNSEL | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.