Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kasper, Kathryn, against Lake Lizzie Reserve Homeowners' Association, Inc., Unknown Party In Possession 2, Unknown Party In Possession 1, Unknown Spouse Of Chance W. Showell, Showell, Chance W, (total of 5) See All represented by Fouladi, Anthony A, Keegan, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with POLODNA, SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC) | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTES - CERTIFICATE OF DISBUIRSEMENT NOT ISSUED, FORM NOT SENT | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2016114676 | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL) | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | SALE SHEET | |
October 10, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE: 10/01/2016 | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.