Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hasselbach, Edward T, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with POLODNA, SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event | EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) 04/07- RESENT TO ATTY | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTY | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2014164457 | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.