Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, Campbell, Andrew, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Parker, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MARQUES, LETICIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | DOR REQUEST FOR COPIES (COPY OF ORDERS, ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT AND PAYMENT HISTORY INCLUDED) | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEARING OFFICER AND FINAL ORDER OF COMMITMENT FOR CONTEMPT / FINAL ORDER OF COMMITMENT FOR CONTEMPT (REC) | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | PURGE RECEIPT | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT RETURNED EXECUTED: 10/18/18/MICHELLE | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | OSCEOLA COUNTY UNIFORM CHARGING AFFIDAVIT | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | AUDIT WORKSHEET AND BAL. ADJ. PER ORDER 10/24/18 | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET FOR MICHELLE, FILED IN OPEN COURTR | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEARING OFFICER AND FINAL ORDER OF COMMITMENT FOR CONTEMPT / FINAL ORDER OF COMMITMENT FOR CONTEMPT, FILED IN OPEN COURT | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE LOG | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.