Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Evans, Brittany, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moon, Marcus, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREARAGE AFFIDAVIT & PAYMENT HISTORY FOR COURT ON 6/21/21 | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | AUDIT WORKSHEET FOR COURT ON 6/21/21 (NO CHANGES MADE) | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DOR COVERSHEET | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING SET FOR 06/21/2021 AT 9:15 AM IN DOR BEFORE JUDGE: FERRER, SHEREA-ANN | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE SUPPORT AND OR ARREARS ORDER | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEARING OFFICER AND FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH CHIDL SUPPORT AND FOR OTHER RELIEF (REC) | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEARING OFFICER AND FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO ESTABLISH CHILD SUPPORT AND FOR OTHER RELIEF / FINAL JUDGMENT | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT ORDER AND FLORIDA ADDENDUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.