Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, Gonzalez, Christie V, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Santiago, Rafael D, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARNOLD, C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2013 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: RAFAEL SANTIAGO (ORDER ON MOTION ON R&R OF THE HEARING OFFICER) | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEARING OFFICER (REC) | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEARING OFFICER | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION SET FOR 10/16/2015 AT 8:00 AM IN DOR BEFORE JUDGE: KATZ, NORBERTO | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | GENERAL TESTIMONY | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | FLORIDA'S UIFSA PETITION | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | UNIFORM SUPPORT PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.