Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Everbank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman, Barry, against All Unknown Parties, Venetian Bay Villages Condominium Association, Inc, Unknown Parties In Possession #2, Unknown Parties In Possession #1, Salgado, Blanca L, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with POLODNA, SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC) | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2015034732 | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | SALE SHEET | |
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL) | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF RIGHT TO BID | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE: | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( REC ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.