Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Colon, Jose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Figueroa, Lissette, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARNOLD, C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DOR REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DOR REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DOR REQUEST FOR AUDIT (AUDIT WORKSHEET ATTACHED) | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | DOR REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.