Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas As Trustee For Rali 2003-Qs17, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Green, Kerry Esq, against Any And All Unknown Parties, Bank Of America, N.A., Piekos, Daniel, Piekos, Lisa M, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 8) See All represented by Steely, Kenneth Scott, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with POLODNA, SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BARRING DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FROM CLAIMING ANY INTEREST ON THE PROPERTY ( REC ) | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BARRING DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FROM CLAIMING ANY INTEREST ON THE PROPERTY | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND BARRING DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FROM CLAIMING ANY INTEREST ON THE PROPERTY | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/31/2014 PARTY SERVED: UNITED STATE OF AMERICA | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC) | |
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS FOR LEAVE TO REFORECLOSE | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2014167652 | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO SERVICEMAIL@ACLAWLLP | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED / UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( EMAIL ATTY ) | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED / DANIEL PIEKOS; LISA M PIEKOS; UNKNOWN TENANT 1 & 2; BANK OF AMERICA NA ( EMAIL ATTY ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.