Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deer Creek Master Homeowners Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lippman, Mark, against Unknown Parties, Tenant #2, Tenant #1, Cuevas-Acevedo, Rosalina, Acevedo, Jacob, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JORDAN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS ( REC ) | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL CONCERNING UNKNOWN PARTIES | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING EXTENSION OF TIME | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE SETTING CASE FOR STATUS HEARING 10/20/14 2:30 PM | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | STATUS HEARING SET FOR 10/20/2014 AT 2:30 PM IN 6E BEFORE JUDGE: FORECLOSURE SENIOR JUDGE | |
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
September 23, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.