Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pincus, against Tenant #2, Tenant #1, Any And All Unknown Parties, The United States Of America, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Craig, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MILLER, JEFFORDS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS ( REC ) | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AS TO PREVAILING PARTY AND ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF AMENDED PRETRIAL CATALOGUE | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTY WITH BLANK ORDERS ATTACHED (NOTE MOOT) | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RE SETTING NON JURY TRIAL FOR JUNE 18 2015 | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/18/2015 AT 9:30 AM IN 5D BEFORE JUDGE: FORECLOSURE SENIOR JUDGE | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.