Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Compass Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant In Possesion #2, Unknown Tenant In Possesion #1, Liberty Village Property Owners Association, Inc., Serrano, Liliana, Serrano, John J, (total of 5) See All represented by Di Masi, John L, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with MILLER, JEFFORDS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (REC) | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PRO SE MOTION IN REGARDS TO FORECLOSURE | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTES - TITLE NOT ISSUED. PENDING OBJECTION;. | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR OBJECTION TO FORECLOSURE DATED JAN. 7 2014 (M/O FTJ) | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE ($100.00 PL) | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | SALE SHEET | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #201402329 | |
December 26, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION, FIRST PUBLICATION DATE: 12/19/13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.