Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Tapia, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JORDAN, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON EX-PARTE MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW SET FOR 07/23/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN 6E BEFORE JUDGE: JORDAN, JOHN E. | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING JULY 23 2014 / 9:00AM / 6E | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING JULY 15 2014 / 9:00AM / 6E | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW SET FOR 07/15/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN 6E BEFORE JUDGE: JORDAN, JOHN E. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING JULY 3 2014 / 9:00AM / 6E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.