Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Home Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Unknown Tenant, The Palms Hotel And Villas Ii Condo Assoc Inc, Parkway Palms Community Services Property Assoc, Syed, Masroor, Syed, Farah, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WALLER, MARGARET T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION / COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS /NOTICE OF HEARING (REC) (NC) | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF STATUS (JT) | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | FILED IN OPEN COURT: ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: NOTICE TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE PROSECUTION DATE: 03/18/2011 TIME: 1:30 PM JUDGE: LEGENDRE, RONALD A LOCATION: COURTROOM 5B RESULT: HEARING HELD | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION/COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/NOTICE OF HEARING NOTICE SENT ON: 01/05/2011 10:16:30 | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FARAH SYED (DEFENDANT); MASROOR SYED (DEFENDANT); | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/19/10 PARKWAY PALMS COMMUNITY SERVICES PROPERTY ASSOC (DEFENDANT); | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 01/14/10 MASROOR SYED (DEFENDANT); | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 01/19/10 THE PALMS HOTEL AND VILLAS II CONDO ASSOC INC (DEFENDANT); | |
January 26, 2010 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 01/14/10 FARAH SYED (DEFENDANT); |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.