Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Suntrust Mortgage Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bannan, Courtney Jared, against Keefe, Dirk P., Unknown Spouse Of Dirk P. Keefe, Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Sub Property, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with WALLER, MARGARET T presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2009 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE (IMG) | |
March 10, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED ON SEPTEMBER 15, 2010 NUNC PRO TUNC | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL REOPEN FEE $50 RECEIPT: 169013 DATE: 03/10/2011 | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED ON SEPTEMBER 15, 2010, NUNC PRO TUNC (NC) | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE (REC) | |
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO) | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT CIVIL REOPEN FEE $50 RECEIPT: 155946 DATE: 11/19/2010 | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING OSCEOLA CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY DATED: 10/29/10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.