Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Adak Of Illinois, Llc., An, Casselberry Restaurants, Inc., Kissimmee Sizzler Family, Plaza International, White, James C., Ii, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Circuit Civil case represented by Esq, against Commercial Mortgage Pass-, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., German American Capital, Global Alliance Finance, Global Franchise Kissimmee, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with KEST, JOHN MARSHALL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2002 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BQ0927 | |
August 27, 2007 | Docket Event | LETTER TO GLOBAL ALLIANCE FINANCE COMPANY LLC GERMAN AMERICAN CAPITAL CORP; DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC. RETURNED TO SENDER (NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION) AA0827 | |
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | 1NHDM 1. DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING TH0816 | |
July 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION TH07 D | |
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DIMISSAL W/PREJUDICE (REC) MP0304 | |
January 24, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE SW0125 | |
April 05, 2004 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AA0405 | |
April 05, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF JAMES C. WHITE, II, PLAZA INTERNATIONAL RESTAURANTS, INC; ADAK OF ILLINOIS, LLC; KISSIMMEE SIZZLER FAMILY STEAKHOUSE, INC. AND CASSELBERRY RESTAURANTS, INC. AA0406 | |
March 15, 2004 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AA0317 | |
March 02, 2004 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM ANSWERED BY: GLOBAL ALLIANCE FINANCE COMPANY, LLC GERMAN AMERICAN CAPITAL CORPORATION AND DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES, INC. AA0304 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.