Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moses, Yaschika, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Grimes, Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2000 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE FROM SHERIFF- WE DON NOT HOLD AN ACTIVE WRIT UNDER THIS CASE-WRIT WAS ALREADY RECALLED-DUPLICATE | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN FROM SHERIFF ORDER OF RECALL OF WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT FILED BY DOR AND RECALL OF WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT / ORDER, FILED IN OPEN COURT | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER RECALLING WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, FILED IN OPEN COURT - RECORDED (OR.5552.632. / 2019086382) | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF IV-D SERVICES | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | DOR REQUEST FOR COPIES (PAY. HIST. INCLUDED) | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER ON MOTION TO ESTABLISH ARREARS (BASED ON COC RECORDS) (REC) | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AUDIT WORKSHEET PER ORDER DATED 8/22/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.