Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Peterson, Stacey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Waits, Eddie, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with BARBOUR, ELAINE A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 1989 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
April 01, 2019 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | BALANCE ADJUSTMENT (DOR INTERCEPT) | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO MODIFY ARREARS PAYMENT / FINAL JUDGMENT (REC) | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | AUDIT WORKSHEET AND BAL. ADJ. PER ORDER 5/29/15 | |
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO MODIFY ARREARS PAYMENT/ FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) FOR EDDIE FILED IN OPEN COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.