Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Jessica Fagen, against Johnpatrick Hicks, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Amy J Carter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Synchrony Bank against the defendant, Johnpatrick Hicks, in the County Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Orange County, Florida. The complaint alleges damages that do not exceed $8,000 and states that the plaintiff has...
Order Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation
Date: July 13, 2021Complaint
Date: December 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation
Judge: Brian Sandor |
|
June 11, 2021 | Hearing | Pre-Trial Civil - Wish, Carly S (Actual: Civil, Pretrial) | |
June 11, 2021 | Hearing | Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial (Actual: Civil, Pretrial) | |
June 11, 2021 | Hearing | Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial
Judge: Amy J Carter |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served
Judge: Amy J Carter |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear Scheduled
Judge: Amy J Carter |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint
Judge: Amy J Carter |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Initiated
Judge: Amy J Carter |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: Amy J Carter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.