Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gonzales, Judy, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Case Cycle Time149 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Traffic Trial
Judge: Vierra, Manuel |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Decision and Notice of Decision | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Law Enforcement Officer's Request for Postponement of | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continued Hearing | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continued Hearing | |
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Courtesy Notice of Hearing | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Continued Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.