Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Michael Tillage, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tiffany Faddis, against Geregory Smith, Miranda Smith, represented by Maura Burgreen, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Paetra Brownlee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaetra Brownlee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCa - Auto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2018Complaint
Date: December 31, 2018Summons Issued Electronically as to
Date: January 09, 2019Answer
Date: February 01, 2019Request to Produce
Date: February 01, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: February 01, 2019Notice Appearance of Counsel
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogatories
Date: February 01, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 11, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 11, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
Date: April 13, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition(s)
Date: April 16, 2019Notice Appearance of Counsel
Date: April 23, 2019Notice of Production of Non-Party
Date: May 13, 2019Notice Appearance of Counsel
Date: July 22, 2019Notice of Production of Non-Party
Date: August 06, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: October 24, 2019Request
Date: December 06, 2019Voluntary Dismissal
Date: April 14, 2020MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED
Date: February 28, 2020Witness and Exhibit List
Date: August 03, 2021Voluntary Dismissal
Date: April 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
April 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production of Non-Party
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Production of Non-Party
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Appearance of Counsel
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.