Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jonathan Meisels, against Cecyle Carson, David K Carson, University Estates Property Owners Association In, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Paetra Brownlee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaetra Brownlee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryCa - Homestead Residential Foreclosure Btwn $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: September 10, 2019Notice
Date: February 27, 2019Summons Returned Unserved
Date: August 06, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2018Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form
Date: December 31, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: December 31, 2018Certificate
Date: December 31, 2018Complaint
Date: December 31, 2018Form "A"
Date: December 31, 2018Summons Issued Electronically as to
Date: January 08, 2019Motion for Substitution of Party
Date: April 04, 2019Final Disposition Form
Date: September 10, 2019Voluntary Dismissal
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Heather Pinder Rodriguez |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Unserved
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Party
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Electronically as to
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Electronically as to
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: Paetra Brownlee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.