Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Artonya Mcneally, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lee F Mcneally, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Jeffrey L Ashton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey L Ashton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategorySexual Violence |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Injunction After Hearing
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Injunction After Hearing Recorded
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order For Temporary Injunction Served
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comprehensive Case History
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Returned Served
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order For Temporary Injunction Served
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
January 16, 2019 | Hearing | Injunctions - Bronson, Theotis (Actual: Bronson, Theotis) | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Injunctions - Bronson, Theotis (Actual: Bronson, Theotis)
Judge: Jeffrey L Ashton |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.