Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nickeisha Rickisha Walker, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ronald Errol Walker, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Vincent S. Chiu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent S. Chiu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2017 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Order of Dismissal After Hearing
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
March 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
March 14, 2019 | Hearing | Case Management Conference - Myers, Donald A, JR (Actual: Myers, Donald A, JR) | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
HEARING - Case Management Conference - Myers, Donald A, JR (Actual: Myers, Donald A, JR)
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Vincent S. Chiu |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.