Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK vs. ELLIS, NICOLE
On August 31, 2017 a ca - breach of agreement/contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL. Judge A James presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2017
Last Refreshed
December 19, 2023
Filing Location
Orange County, FL
Judge
Hon. A James
Category
CA - Breach of Agreement/Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Dismissal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint was filed on August 31, 2017, with the filing number 61228490.
As for violations of statutes, the text does not explicitly mention any violations. Therefore, there are no statutes to extract from this document.
...Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Voluntary Dismissal
Date: Dec 20, 2017Final Disposition Form
Date: Dec 20, 2017Suggestion - Notice of Bankruptcy and Auto Stay
Date: Nov 29, 2017Summons Returned Served
Date: Nov 17, 2017Summons Issued Electronically as to
Date: Sep 07, 2017Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Aug 31, 2017Complaint
Date: Aug 31, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal
Judge: A James Craner |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form
Judge: A James Craner |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 58602541 | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Suggestion - Notice of Bankruptcy and Auto Stay
Judge: A James Craner |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served
Judge: A James Craner |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Electronically as to
Judge: A James Craner |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet
Judge: A James Craner |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint
Judge: A James Craner |