Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Grisel Hernandez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scot Strems, against Castle Key Insurance Company, represented by Darryl Gavin, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Reginald K Whitehead presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2017 |
CategoryCa - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Grisel Hernandez against Castle Key Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of the 9th Judicial Circuit in Orange County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that they suffered a loss due to water discharge in the kitchen, which ...
Correspondence
Date: March 26, 2019Joint Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: September 26, 2018Order of Dismissal
Date: March 25, 2019Joint Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: March 08, 2019Joint Stipulation of Dismissal
Date: September 26, 2018Complaint
Date: March 16, 2017Request for Admissions
Date: March 20, 2017Request to Produce
Date: March 20, 2017Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2017Request to Produce
Date: April 13, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 12, 2017Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 08, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 08, 2017Motion In Limine
Date: July 19, 2017Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 13, 2017Disclosure of Experts
Date: December 22, 2017Response to Request to Produce
Date: December 13, 2017Motion In Limine
Date: January 22, 2018Answer to Interrogatories
Date: December 13, 2017Request to Produce
Date: January 11, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: October 16, 2017Order of Dismissal
Date: March 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Correspondence
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal
Judge: Reginald K Whitehead |
|
March 26, 2018 | Hearing | CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - LeBlanc, Bob | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
HEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference - LeBlanc, Bob
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness List
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Witness and Exhibit List
Judge: Lisa T. Munyon |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.