Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Accounting Professionals Group Inc, filed a(n) Bc - Trade Secrets case represented by Michael Nardella, against S And V Accounting Services Inc, Sharon M Juarez, Vianka E Gil, represented by Douglas Ackerman, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Julie H O'Kane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2016 |
CategoryBc - Trade Secrets |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
|
Certificate of Service 53593388
Date: November 30, 2016Request for Admissions 53678301
Date: December 02, 2016Answer & Affirmative Defenses 53970896
Date: December 19, 2016Notice of Intent 53678297 Comments: TO SERVE SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY
Date: December 02, 2016Response to Request for Admissions 54306997
Date: January 13, 2017Response to Request to Produce 54307906
Date: January 13, 2017Notice of Intent 53582216 Comments: TO SERVE SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY
Date: November 29, 2016Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 54313930
Date: January 13, 2017Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 54345814
Date: January 17, 2017Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 54313934
Date: January 13, 2017Order Setting Case Management Conference 53827392 Comments: 5/4/17 @ 10:00 Am
Date: December 13, 2016Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 54309341
Date: January 13, 2017Notice of Intent 53582215 Comments: TO SERVE SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY
Date: November 29, 2016Request to Produce 54463680 Comments: Second Request
Date: January 27, 2017Response to Request for Admissions 54294387
Date: January 12, 2017Request to Produce 53582214
Date: November 29, 2016Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time 53581260
Date: November 29, 2016Request to Produce 53582212
Date: November 29, 2016Response to Request for Admissions 54295896
Date: January 12, 2017Joint Stipulation 54694625 Comments: for Entry of Consent FJ and Permanent Injunction
Date: February 15, 2017Request to Produce 54404658
Date: January 24, 2017Response to Request to Produce 54304368
Date: January 13, 2017Motion for Oral Argument 53885083 Comments: (Pltfs) on Pltfs Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: December 14, 2016Notice of Intent 53678296 Comments: TO SERVE SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY
Date: December 02, 2016Order Designating Case a Complex Case 53827390
Date: December 13, 2016Notice of Service of Interrogatories 53582209
Date: November 29, 2016Response to Request to Produce 54307907
Date: January 13, 2017Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 54345815
Date: January 17, 2017Request to Produce 53582211
Date: November 29, 2016Final Judgment 54707894
Date: February 16, 2017Voluntary Dismissal 64551687
Date: March 20, 2019Request for Admissions 53678300
Date: December 02, 2016Notice to Parties 53827391
Date: December 13, 2016Affidavit of Service 53504986 Comments: S & V ACCOUNTI NG SERVICES, INC
Date: November 23, 2016Affidavit of Service 53344876 Comments: VIANKA E GIL
Date: November 16, 2016Subpoena Returned Served 54049122 Comments: transcoast services llc
Date: December 21, 2016Affidavit of Service 53314203 Comments: SHARON M JUAREZ
Date: November 15, 2016Subpoena Returned Served 53928258 Comments: for the UPS Store
Date: December 16, 2016Request for Admissions 53678298
Date: December 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal 64551687 | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Judgment 54707894 | |
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation 54694625 Comments: for Entry of Consent FJ and Permanent Injunction | |
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Produce 54463680 Comments: Second Request | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Produce 54404658 | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended Order 54349458 Comments: granting motion for oral argument on Pltfs verified motion for preliminary injunction 3/2/17 9:00 | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 54345814 | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 54345815 | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions 54306997 | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce 54307906 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.