Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Quality One Wireless Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Charles Lane, against Liquid Image Co Llc, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Julie H O'Kane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2016 |
CategoryBc - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Filing 52995138 Comments: affidavit of charles lane as to interest and cost
Date: October 31, 2016Notice 53009040 Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: November 01, 2016Civil Cover Sheet 52109761
Date: September 20, 2016Motion for Final Judgment 52994648 Comments: (Pltfs)
Date: October 31, 2016Proposed Writ of Garnishment to be Issued by Clerk 53437926 Comments: Wells Fargo Bank
Date: November 22, 2016Motion for Default 52731923 Comments: as to liquid image co llc
Date: October 18, 2016Summons Issued Electronically as to 52194523
Date: September 23, 2016Order of Reassignment 52933942 Comments: to Div 32
Date: October 28, 2016Order Designating Case a Complex Case 52933938
Date: October 28, 2016Notice of Filing 52995134 Comments: affidavit of john chiorando
Date: October 31, 2016Notice of Filing 52304556 Comments: verified return of service
Date: September 27, 2016Order Setting Case Management Conference 52933941 Comments: 4/3/17 11:30
Date: October 28, 2016Motion for Writ of Garnishment 53437925
Date: November 22, 2016Final Judgment 53248311
Date: November 14, 2016Answer of Garnishee 53822162
Date: December 12, 2016Notice to Parties 52933940
Date: October 28, 2016Complaint 52109762
Date: September 20, 2016Default Entered by the Clerk 52764883
Date: October 21, 2016Writ of Garnishment Issued 53468070 Comments: email to atty
Date: November 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Garnishment 53828163 Comments: answer and notice of right to seek dissolution of writ of garnishment | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer of Garnishee 53822162 | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment Issued 53468070 Comments: email to atty | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Writ of Garnishment to be Issued by Clerk 53437926 Comments: Wells Fargo Bank | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Writ of Garnishment 53437925 | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Judgment 53248311 | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice 53009040 Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing 52995138 Comments: affidavit of charles lane as to interest and cost | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Final Judgment 52994648 Comments: (Pltfs) | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing 52995134 Comments: affidavit of john chiorando |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.