Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lucenda Components Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ryan Cipparone, against Exxelia Dearborn Inc, represented by James Robinson, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Julie H O'Kane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2016 |
CategoryBc - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil Cover Sheet 50636427
Date: July 25, 2016Order Enlargement and Extension of Time 54306901
Date: January 18, 2017Complaint 50636428
Date: July 25, 2016Order of Reassignment 51644577 Comments: to Div 32
Date: September 01, 2016Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 54482493 Comments: AMENDED - *waiting for order*
Date: January 30, 2017Answer & Affirmative Defenses 52196046 Comments: to Amended Counterclaims
Date: September 22, 2016Notice of Service of Interrogatories 51838267
Date: September 09, 2016Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counter Claim/Counter Petition 51455617
Date: August 24, 2016Notice Appearance of Counsel 51696240 Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: September 02, 2016Order of Dismissal 54491161
Date: January 31, 2017Amended Answer 51683540 Comments: AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS
Date: September 02, 2016Order Setting Case Management Conference 51644580 Comments: 3/9/17 @ 10:00 Am
Date: September 01, 2016Notice to Parties 53977649 Comments: notice of hearing room location change effective 1/1/17
Date: December 20, 2016Notice to Parties 51644571
Date: September 01, 2016Order Designating Case a Complex Case 51644573
Date: September 01, 2016Acceptance of Service 51009289
Date: August 05, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal 54491161 | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation 54492921 Comments: for dismissal | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 54482493 Comments: AMENDED - *waiting for order* | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 54483395 Comments: and notice with prejudice *waiting for order* | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Enlargement and Extension of Time 54306901 | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter 54314248 | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time 54264272 Comments: TO FILE A REPLY TO EXXELIA DEARBORNS INC OPPOSITION TO LUCENDA COMPONENTS INCS MOTION TO DISMISS; BY LUCENDA COMPONENTS INC | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to Parties 53977649 Comments: notice of hearing room location change effective 1/1/17 | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter 53737163 | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Granting 53711967 Comments: pltf/counter deft motion for enlargement of time to file a reply to Exxelia Darborn oppositiion to Lucenda Components motin to dismiss counterclaims for conversion and unjust enrichment,a nd respond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.