Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Commercial Business Finance Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jocelyne Macelloni, against Allen Electric Supply Co, Anthony W Brown, Atlantic Controls Corporation, Richard S Gall, represented by John Benford, Kathryn Masters, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, FL, . Orange County, FL Superior Courts with Julie H O'Kane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2016 |
CategoryBc - Breach Of Agreement/Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOrange County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 52203832
Date: September 23, 2016Order Designating Case a Complex Case 49541525
Date: June 09, 2016Objection 50863319 Comments: to Pltf's Request for Production of Documents
Date: July 29, 2016Notice of Withdrawal 54684164 Comments: OF FEBRUARY 13, 2017 NOTICE OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: February 14, 2017Response to Request to Produce 53348273
Date: November 16, 2016Notice to Parties 53974165 Comments: notice of hearing room location change effective 1/1/17
Date: December 20, 2016Reply 53524299
Date: November 28, 2016Joint Stipulation of Dismissal 55403435
Date: April 11, 2017Joint Motion 54314133
Date: January 13, 2017Motion to Compel Discovery 53034938 Comments: (pltfs)
Date: November 02, 2016Notice of Service 54120823 Comments: Document Responsive to Pltf's Request for Production
Date: December 29, 2016Complaint 48844760
Date: May 12, 2016Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories 52522740
Date: October 05, 2016Notice 54770410 Comments: of Fully Briefed Motion
Date: February 21, 2017Notice Appearance of Counsel 49585910
Date: June 09, 2016Summons Issued Electronically as to 48844266 Comments: E-Mail Attorney
Date: May 13, 2016Voluntary Dismissal 53345010
Date: November 16, 2016Status Report 53159897 Comments: JOINT
Date: November 08, 2016Request to Produce 50092323
Date: June 29, 2016Civil Cover Sheet 48842768
Date: May 11, 2016Voluntary Dismissal 53345010 Comments: as to counts V,VI, VII
Date: November 16, 2016Order Setting Case Management Conference 52864473 Comments: 11/18/16 @ 11:00 Am
Date: October 26, 2016Request to Produce 50092325
Date: June 29, 2016Notice 54400497 Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED JOINT MOTION
Date: January 24, 2017Request to Produce 52746947 Comments: of documents to defendant Richard S Gall
Date: October 19, 2016Notice 54781041 Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: February 21, 2017Order Setting Case Management Conference 49541531 Comments: 11/3/16 @ 4:00 Pm
Date: June 09, 2016Answer & Affirmative Defenses 49732849
Date: June 14, 2016Order Granting 54430184 Comments: Joint Motion to Deviate from Case Mgt Order Dated 12/2/16
Date: January 26, 2017Case Management Order 53610338
Date: December 02, 2016Response to Request to Produce 53348272
Date: November 16, 2016Summons Issued Electronically as to 48844277 Comments: E-Mail Attorney
Date: May 13, 2016Addendum to 48842771
Date: May 12, 2016Summons Issued Electronically as to 48844280 Comments: E-Mail Attorney
Date: May 13, 2016Summons Issued Electronically as to 48844271 Comments: E-Mail Attorney
Date: May 13, 2016Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 55403435
Date: April 11, 2017Response to Request to Produce 53435514
Date: November 21, 2016Response 49590500
Date: June 09, 2016Notice 54663013 Comments: NOTICE OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: February 13, 2017Certification Settlement Authority 54687479
Date: February 14, 2017Notice 51213782 Comments: JOINT NOTICE OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: August 15, 2016Affidavit of Service 49180697 Comments: ANTHONY W BROWN
Date: May 24, 2016Affidavit of Service 49180701 Comments: ATLANTIC CONTROLS CORPORATION
Date: May 24, 2016Notice of Service of Interrogatories 50092317
Date: June 29, 2016Return of Service of Summons 49167739 Comments: RICHARD S GALL
Date: May 23, 2016Return of Service of Summons 49167740 Comments: ALLEN ELECTRIC SUPPLY CO
Date: May 23, 2016Notice of Service of Interrogatories 50092321
Date: June 29, 2016Notice to Parties 49541529
Date: June 09, 2016Notice Appearance of Counsel 49392229
Date: June 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Suggestion - Notice of Bankruptcy and Auto Stay 57660661 Comments: Defendant, Anthony W. Brown, Case Number 3:17-bk-03560 | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Denying 55396118 Comments: pltf's motion for leave to file a surreply to deft's motion for leave to file pleadings with cross, counter and third party claims | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation of Dismissal 55403435 | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation for Dismissal 55403435 | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter 55002907 | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence 54980376 | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance 54873858 Comments: WITH THE COURT S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DATED DECEMBER 2, 2016 AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Oral Argument 54781040 Comments: ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REHEARING/RECONSIDERATION AND/OR CLARIFICATION OF 12/19 ORDER; BY ATLANTIC CONTROLS CORPORATION | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice 54770410 Comments: of Fully Briefed Motion | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice 54781041 Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.